|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Cortez, Fannin, and Robideaux.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate Conference Committee membership changed: McPherson vice Mount.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Michot, Jackson, L., and Mount.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported with amendments (21-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|