05/24/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/13/2010 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |||
05/12/2010 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
04/28/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/27/2010 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/21/2010 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary C. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary C. |