|
06/21/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 24. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
By a vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Reported with amendments (22-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/02.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/01.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 05/25.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|