|
06/18/2010
|
Effective date 6/18/10.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Reported favorably (16-0-1) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 7 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 05/04.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|