06/04/2010 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
06/03/2010 | Reported favorably (9-3) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/19/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/18/2010 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/13/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |