|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|