06/16/2010 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
06/02/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
06/02/2010 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/27/2010 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 6 for 06/02. | |||
05/27/2010 | Rules suspended | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 6 for 06/01. | |||
05/19/2010 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 6 for 05/25. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/17/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance. |