04/12/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
04/08/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
03/31/2010 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
03/31/2010 | Rules suspended | |||
03/30/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |||
03/19/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |