LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB494
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB494
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB494
Action History
05/19/2010
Reconsidered. Read by title as amended; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
05/18/2010
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
05/18/2010
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 25 nays.
05/13/2010
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
05/12/2010
Reported with amendments.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
03/19/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B.