|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Greene, and Michael Jackson.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Michot, Marionneaux, and Amedee.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read by title; ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|