|
06/11/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|