Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
04/27/2010
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/26/2010
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/22/2010
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
04/21/2010
Reported with amendments.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare.
03/19/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare.