|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|