06/04/2010 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/03/2010 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 24 nays. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/03. | |||
06/01/2010 | Rules suspended | |||
05/27/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/26/2010 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/19/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |