06/21/2010 | Called from the Calendar. Read by title and withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | |||
06/11/2010 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/11/2010 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |||
06/11/2010 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/11/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary C. | |||
03/19/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary C. |