|
06/30/2010
|
Effective date 6/30/10.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 798.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22/10.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Gallot, Robideaux, and Henry.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Walsworth, Kostelka, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 16 nays.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|