05/06/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/05/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/04/2010 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/04/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
04/20/2010 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/20/2010 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
04/13/2010 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Environmental Quality. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Environmental Quality. |