|
06/29/2010
|
Effective date 7/1/10.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 635.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|