|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Gallot, and Richard.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hebert, Kostelka, and Jackson, L..
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|