|
06/21/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 339.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Insurance.
|
|
|