|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 45. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|