|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date 7/1/10.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 868.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22/10.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Ligi, Fannin, and Lorusso.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Marionneaux, and Alario.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|