|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chaisson, Quinn, and Marionneaux.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Mills, Tim Burns, and Tucker.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 31 yeas and 6 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
By a vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|