|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 898.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported favorably (9-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|