|
06/29/2010
|
Effective date 10/1/10.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 674.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22/10.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Wooton, and White.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Dorsey, and Guillory.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|