|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 903.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|