|
07/06/2010
|
Effective date 1/1/11.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 974.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/22.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|