|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 904.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Burns, Henry, Gallot, and Smith, Jane.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Kostelka, Adley, and Jackson, L..
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 259. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|