|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 906.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 34. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 618. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|