|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date 1/1/11.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 996.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 18 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement.
|
|
|