06/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/15/2010 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | |||
04/20/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/19/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/15/2010 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
04/14/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |