06/07/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
05/26/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/26/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/25/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/25/2010 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
05/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |||
05/19/2010 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/18/2010 | Reported favorably (9-0). | |||
04/07/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
04/06/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
03/30/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |