06/07/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/03/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/02/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
05/27/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/20/2010 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |||
05/05/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
05/04/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/04/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/03/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |