|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|