|
06/07/2010
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. The resolution, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Reported favorably (20-0).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|