Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
04/27/2010
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
04/22/2010
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
04/21/2010
Received from the House without amendments.
04/20/2010
Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
04/19/2010
Received in the House from the Senate.
04/19/2010
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.