|
06/07/2010
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 85 yeas, 2 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|