06/07/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
05/10/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/10/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/05/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/05/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
05/04/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/04/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/04/2010 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |||
05/04/2010 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/03/2010 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |