06/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/15/2010 | Reported with amendments (8-7). | |||
06/03/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
06/02/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
06/01/2010 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
06/01/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/24/2010 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/24/2010 | Committee amendments read and adopted. | |||
05/19/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
05/11/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |