06/21/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24. | |||
06/09/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/08/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/07/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/07/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
06/04/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
06/04/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
04/13/2010 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/29/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |