06/07/2010 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/04/2010 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/03/2010 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
06/02/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
06/01/2010 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |