LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCSR3
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCSR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCSR3
Action History
06/07/2010
Returned to the Senate and approved.
06/07/2010
Approved on 6/7/2010.
06/02/2010
Study request list distributed to members on 6/2/2010.
05/26/2010
Sent to the House.
05/18/2010
Study request list distributed to the members on 5/18/10.
05/17/2010
Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
05/17/2010
Received by the Senate Office on 5/17/10.