06/17/2010 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | |||
06/17/2010 | Approved on 6/17/2010. | |||
06/15/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/15/2010. | |||
06/14/2010 | Received on 6/14/2010. | |||
06/14/2010 | Sent to the House. | |||
06/09/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/9/10. | |||
06/08/2010 | Request study by the committee on Judiciary A. | |||
06/08/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/8/10. |