LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR11
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR11
Action History
06/07/2010
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
06/02/2010
Read by title and adopted.
06/02/2010
Called from the calendar.
06/01/2010
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
06/01/2010
Committee amendments read and adopted.
05/26/2010
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
03/31/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.