|
04/14/2011
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Becomes Act No. 43.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2011.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read by title, rules suspended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2011
|
Read by title.
|
|
|