|
04/14/2011
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 64, nays 35, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2011.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported with amendments (15-4) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. Referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2011
|
Read by title.
|
|
|