04/15/2011 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
04/07/2011 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/05/2011 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/04/2011 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
04/04/2011 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
04/04/2011 | Rules suspended | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/28/2011 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |||
03/27/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |