04/11/2011 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/06/2011 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 04/07. | |||
04/06/2011 | Reconsidered. | |||
04/05/2011 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
04/05/2011 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 20 nays. | |||
04/04/2011 | By a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays. | |||
04/04/2011 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 04/05. | |||
03/30/2011 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 04/04. | |||
03/30/2011 | Rules suspended | |||
03/30/2011 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
03/20/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/19/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |