04/12/2011 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
04/05/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/05/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/05/2011 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 15 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/04/2011 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 04/05. | |||
04/04/2011 | Rules suspended | |||
04/04/2011 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
03/20/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/18/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |