|
07/01/2011
|
Effective date: July 1, 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 12.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read by title. Considered in Committee of the Whole, reported with amendments, amendments adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House floor amendments adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/25/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|